Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Business Income
Sponsored by
Delegate Buckel
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for the amount of qualified business income of the individual deducted under the federal income tax; providing for the continuation of the subtraction modification if the provisions of § 199A of the Internal Revenue Code are repealed or terminate; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0591
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Business Income
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Business Income
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM