Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Polling Places - Electioneering
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott, Afzali, Aumann, Boteler, Dwyer, Eckardt, Frank, George, Haddaway-Riccio, Hogan, Hough, Impallaria, Kipke, Krebs, McComas, W. Miller, Norman, Smigiel, Stocksdale, Szeliga, and Vitale
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that electioneering be allowed on the premises of a public building that is used for a polling place up to a specified electioneering boundary; requiring that campaign signs be allowed on the premises of a public building that is used for a polling place for, at a minimum, specified time periods; prohibiting a polling place from being located in a privately owned building except under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0542
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {355969/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {664134/1
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Committee Amendment Withdrawn
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2013 2/05/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments {355969/1 Report Adopted 45
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 47
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable with Amendments {664134/1 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Committee Amendment Withdrawn 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM