Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University System of Maryland - Institution Management - Admissions Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott, Aumann, Bates, Boteler, Dwyer, Eckardt, Elliott, Frank, George, Impallaria, Kipke, Krebs, McComas, McDonough, McMillan, W. Miller, Smigiel, Szeliga, Vitale, and Wood
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each institution or school within the University System of Maryland to maintain its total student body in a specified manner.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0808
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2013 2/05/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2013 4/02/2013 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-104.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM