Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools and Institutions of Higher Education - Artificial Trans Fat - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Carter
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a public school or public institution of higher education from storing, distributing, holding for service, using in the preparation of any menu item, or serving food containing artificial trans fat; and defining "artificial trans fat" as the specific type of fat formed by adding hydrogen to liquid vegetable oil to make the oil more solid, and including partially hydrogenated vegetable shortening, margarine, and vegetable oil.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0251
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/10/2014 2/11/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-118, 7-436 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM