Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Legal Presence and Tuition Rates - Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott, Aumann, Bates, Boteler, Dwyer, Eckardt, Elliott, Fisher, Frank, George, Impallaria, Kipke, Krebs, McComas, McDonough, McMillan, W. Miller, Smigiel, Szeliga, Vitale, and Wood
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring public institutions of higher education to report annually, on or before October 1, to the Maryland Higher Education Commission the number of students attending that institution who are legally present, or not legally present, in the United States, and the number of students who pay in-State versus out-of-state tuition rates, disaggregated by specified categories; requiring the Commission to report annually, on or before December 31, to the General Assembly specified information; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Appropriations and Ways and Means
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing cancelled (Appropriations)
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-408 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM