Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Graduate Level Education - Exemption from Paying Nonresident Tuition - Members of the United States Armed Forces
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Boteler, Cardin, Carr, Cullison, Frick, Howard, Ivey, Kaiser, Luedtke, A. Miller, Reznik, Rosenberg, Summers, F. Turner, Vaughn, Walker, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting active duty members and honorably discharged veterans of the United States armed forces who attend a public institution of higher education within 5 years of the honorable discharge from paying nonresident tuition rates at the public institution of higher education for graduate level education; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0705
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-106.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM