Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - New and Changed Rates - Notice Period
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering from 30 days to 22 business days the period during which a public service company is required to provide notice to the Public Service Commission before establishing a new rate or changing a current rate; altering from 30 days to 22 business days the period during which a public service company must publish a new rate or change in rate in specified schedules; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page