Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Support Guidelines - Treatment of Alimony Payments
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that, under the child support guidelines, if the alimony or maintenance actually paid by a payor is not deductible by the payor for federal income tax purposes, the amount of alimony or maintenance subtracted from the income of the payor under a certain provision of law is the amount of alimony or maintenance actually paid by the payor, multiplied by a certain factor; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Child Support Guidelines - Treatment of Alimony Payments
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Child Support Guidelines - Treatment of Alimony Payments
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Child Support Guidelines - Treatment of Alimony Payments
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
Text - Third - Child Support Guidelines - Treatment of Alimony Payments
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-2) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM