Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Senior Call-Check Service Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Angel, Barkley, B. Barnes, Barve, Branch, Brooks, Chang, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Healey, Krimm, Luedtke, McComas, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, Carey, Frick, Glenn, Jameson, Lisanti, Vaughn, and C. Wilson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the purpose of the Universal Service Trust Fund; requiring the Legislative Auditor to conduct specified postaudits for a specified additional purpose; requiring the Department of Information Technology, in consultation with the Department of Aging, to establish and maintain the Senior Call-Check Service Program; authorizing the Department to contract with a private vendor or nonprofit organization to provide the specified service; providing immunity from liability or criminal penalty for administrators of the program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {423590/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-38)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2016 2/08/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments {423590/1 Report Adopted 41
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
House 3/14/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (98-38) 43A
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 First Reading Finance 44
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3A-101, 3A-501, 3A-506, 3A-701, 3A-702 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM