Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 674
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering specified requirements for the resident agent of a Maryland corporation, a limited partnership, and a Maryland statutory trust; prohibiting the charter or bylaws of a corporation from imposing liability on a specified stockholder for the attorney's fees or expenses of the corporation or any other party in connection with an internal corporate claim; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0481
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {263098/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 674
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {263098/1 Adopted 41
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 43
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 42
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Motion Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 56
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 674
Text - Chapter - Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-104, 1-101, 1-203, 12-203, 1-301, 2-108, 2-113, 2-212, 2-514, 3-507, 3-515, 5-207, 8-601.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM