Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A-7 License
Sponsored by
Baltimore City Delegation
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to issue a Class A-7 beer, wine, and liquor license which authorizes the holder to sell alcoholic beverages for off-premises consumption at certain times; providing that license holders who hold a certain class of license are eligible to exchange that license for a Class A-7 license under certain circumstances; specifying that in a certain legislative district a Class B-D-7 license may be exchanged for a Class A-7 license only under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0519
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A-7 License
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {653193/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A-7 License
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A-7 License
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Favorable with Amendments {653193/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A-7 License
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 46A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-102, 12-902.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM