Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Sexual Assault Policies - Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegates Morales, Afzali, Clippinger, Gaines, Gutierrez, Haynes, Hettleman, Hornberger, Jackson, Jones, Kelly, Korman, Krimm, Lisanti, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Vogt, Walker, and C. Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the governing boards of specified institutions of higher education to update and submit to the Maryland Higher Education Commission a specified written policy on sexual assault by August 1, 2016; requiring the sexual assault policy to include specified procedures; requiring the policy to require an institution of higher education to enter into and update specified memoranda of understanding; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0817
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-601 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM