Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Electronic Smoking Devices - Policy and Disciplinary Standards
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Miller, Brooks, Hettleman, Hixson, Jalisi, Lam, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education, after consultation with each local school system, to develop, on or before April 1, 2017, a specified model policy prohibiting the use of specified electronic smoking devices on school property, on school buses, and at school-sponsored events; requiring that the model policy contain specified information; requiring specified county boards of education to establish specified policies prohibiting the use of electronic smoking devices at specified locations and specified events; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Ways and Means and Economic Matters
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-438 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM