Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - High School Graduation Requirements - Students in Foster Care or Homeless Youth
Sponsored by
Delegates Guyton, Feldmark, Griffith, Hill, Ivey, and Wilson
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a county board of education to waive high school graduation requirements established by the county board that are in addition to high school graduation requirements established by the State Board of Education for a student in foster care or who is a homeless youth if while in grade 11 or 12 the youth transfers into the local school system from a different system in the State; prohibiting a county board from waiving certain requirements; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0564
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {705566/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - High School Graduation Requirements - Students in Foster Care or Homeless Youth
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments {705566/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - High School Graduation Requirements - Students in Foster Care or Homeless Youth
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Age
(   7-205 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:04 PM
Click to return on the top page