Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by Merger
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a process for the formation of a specified holding company through the merger of a Maryland parent corporation with or into a specified wholly owned subsidiary of the Maryland parent corporation; providing that a vote of the stockholders of the parent corporation is not necessary to authorize the merger except under specified circumstances; requiring that the merger be approved by a majority of the entire board of directors of the parent corporation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0398
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by Merger
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by Merger
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by Merger
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by Merger
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 41
Text - Third - Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by Merger
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 43
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 42
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Text - Chapter - Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by Merger
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-106.2, 8-501.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM