Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Historic Revitalization Tax Credit – Expansion – Rehabilitations of Common Elements of Condominiums and Cooperative Projects
Sponsored by
Delegates McIntosh, Anderson, and Boyce
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 314
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "small commercial project" under the historic revitalization tax credit program to include rehabilitations of structures that are condominiums and cooperative projects if the rehabilitations target only common elements of the condominiums or cooperative projects; requiring the Director of the Maryland Historical Trust, in consultation with the Smart Growth Subcabinet, to adopt regulations establishing application procedures for governing bodies of condominiums; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {435867/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 314
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Historic Revitalization Tax Credit - Expansion - Rehabilitations of Common Elements of Condominiums
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable with Amendments {435867/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Historic Revitalization Tax Credit – Expansion – Rehabilitations of Common Elements of Condominiums and Cooperative Projects
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 314
Text - Chapter - Historic Revitalization Tax Credit – Expansion – Rehabilitations of Common Elements of Condominiums and Cooperative Projects
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:04 PM
Click to return on the top page