Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Privatization of the Intercounty Connector and the I-95 Express Toll Lanes
Sponsored by
Delegates Fisher, Afzali, Boteler, Dwyer, Eckardt, George, Haddaway-Riccio, Krebs, McComas, McConkey, McDermott, A. Miller, W. Miller, Myers, Norman, Otto, Schuh, and Smigiel
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority, in consultation with the Secretary of Transportation, to initiate the process to issue a request for proposals on or before December 31, 2013 to privatize the Intercounty Connector (ICC/MD 200) and the I-95 Express Toll Lanes north of Baltimore City; providing that the request for proposals be issued in accordance with specified procurement requirements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1232 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM