Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Out-of-State Civil Unions - Applicability of Domestic Relations Laws
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that parties to a civil union validly entered into in another state or country shall be subject to the law of domestic relations of the State to the same degree and in the same manner as prescribed under the law of the State for married individuals.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM