Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Anderson, Angel, Barkley, B. Barnes, Bromwell, Carr, Clippinger, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Hettleman, Hill, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, McCray, Miele, Moon, Morales, Platt, Reznik, S. Robinson, Smith, Waldstreicher, P. Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from selling or offering for sale within the State specified food fish or shellfish unless the person identifies the species of food fish or shellfish in a specified manner; prohibiting a person from knowingly misidentifying the species of specified food fish or shellfish on a label, sign, or menu; prohibiting a person from knowingly selling or offering for sale within the State specified crab products identified as "blue crab" except under specified conditions; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0557
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0913 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-11F-01 through 4-11F-07 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM