Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Criminal Citations - Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegates Washington, Barron, Carr, Charkoudian, Kelly, Korman, R. Lewis, Moon, Solomon, and Sydnor
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain law enforcement officers to record certain information pertaining to the issuance of certain citations; requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission and the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center, in consultation with the Administrative Office of the Courts, to develop a certain format for the recording of certain data and to develop certain procedures relating to the compilation and submission of certain data by December 31, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0566
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Criminal Citations - Reporting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Criminal Citations - Reporting
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM