Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing specified organizations in Anne Arundel County to conduct a card game, card tournament, or casino event under specified circumstances; requiring an organization to obtain a permit from the County Department of Inspections and Permits; specifying that a permit holder may receive no more than one permit per calendar year; requiring an individual who volunteers as an operator of a card game, card tournament, or casino event to be at least 21 years of age; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0521
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {485366/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
56A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments {485366/1 Report Adopted 57
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 58
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 56A
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-401, 13-404, 13-404.1, 13-408 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM