Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Forest Conservation – Technical Study and Programmatic Review
Sponsored by
Delegates Healey, Barkley, Carr, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Hayes, Hettleman, Hill, Jones, Korman, Lafferty, Lam, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, McIntosh, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, Robinson, Turner, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (114-25)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Legislative Services, in consultation with certain entities, to undertake a technical study to review changes in forest cover and tree canopy in the State; requiring the study to include surveys and mapping and certain analyses related to forest conservation; requiring the Department to submit the study and a certain programmatic review to the Governor and the General Assembly by November 15, 2018; requiring the Department to convene a work session by November 30, 2018, to consider certain findings; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0610
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {180018/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {763724/1 (Delegate Impallaria) Rejected (46-87)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Forest Conservation – Technical Study and Programmatic Review
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-25)
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Natural Resources - Forest Conservation Act - Standards and Requirements
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments {180018/1 Adopted 66
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Floor Amendment {763724/1 (Delegate Impallaria) Rejected (46-87) 66
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
Text - Third - Forest Conservation – Technical Study and Programmatic Review
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (114-25) 68
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM