Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Animal Welfare - Spay/Neuter Fund - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegate Frush (Chair, Task Force on the Establishment of a Statewide Spay/Neuter Fund) and Delegates S. Robinson, Arora, Barkley, Barnes, Barve, Beidle, Bobo, Cane, Cardin, Carr, Davis, Frick, Gaines, George, Gilchrist, Guzzone, Haddaway-Riccio, Haynes, Healey, Hogan, Holmes, Hubbard, Hucker, Ivey, Kach, A. Kelly, Kipke, Kramer, Lafferty, Lee, Love, Luedtke, Malone, McComas, McIntosh, McMillan, A. Miller, Minnick, Morhaim, Niemann, Olszewski, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reznik, Swain, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, Weir, Wilson, Zucker, Busch, Glenn, and Stein
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 562
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Spay/Neuter Fund within the Department of Agriculture; stating the purpose of the Fund; specifying the contents of the Fund; requiring the Department to establish a specified fee on specified commercial feed prepared and distributed for consumption by dogs or cats and deposit the revenue into the Fund; authorizing the Fund to be used to establish a competitive grant program to support the provision of spay/neuter services; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0820
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {280914/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (113-23)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-1)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 562
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/08/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Favorable with Amendments {280914/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Third Reading Passed (113-23) 48A
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (43-1) 63
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 562
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1601 through 2-1605 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM