Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mass Transit Trust Fund
Sponsored by
Delegate Bates
Status
In the House - Reassigned to Ways and Means and Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Mass Transit Trust Fund (MTTF) in the Maryland Department of Transportation; requiring that the MTTF be used for specified purposes; requiring the Department to identify and establish a funding source for specified expenses for mass transit in the State; prohibiting the Department from using funds deposited in the Transportation Trust Fund to support specified expenses for mass transit in the State; providing that MTTF funds may not revert to or be credited to the State general or special funds, as specified; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Reassigned to Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
27
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Reassigned to Ways and Means and Appropriations 27
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/06/2013 Text - First - Mass Transit Trust Fund
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM