Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Regulated Firearms - Encoded Ammunition - Tax
Sponsored by
Delegate Burns
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to sell ammunition for a regulated firearm on or after a specified date only in accordance with the Act; requiring an ammunition manufacturer to encode ammunition for a regulated firearm in a specified way; requiring the Secretary of State Police, beginning on a specified date, to establish and maintain an encoded ammunition database; imposing a tax of 5 cents per round on the sale of encoded ammunition beginning on a specified date; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Hearing cancelled (Ways and Means)
House 3/01/2013 3/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-101, 5-601 through 5-607 )
(   1-101, 11-1B-01 through 11-1B-05, 11-501, 11-502, 2-1303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM