Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution
Sponsored by
Delegates Conway, Costa, Jacobs, Malone, Morhaim, Otto, Rudolph, Wood, Hubbard, and Krebs
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that each county distribute a specified minimum percentage of funds that the county receives from the Senator William H. Amoss Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Fund to volunteer fire, rescue, and ambulance companies; requiring the Director of the Maryland Emergency Management Agency to submit an annual report to the General Assembly on the money distributed by each county to volunteer companies; requiring each county to provide a specified report; establishing a workgroup to study specified laws and policies; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0899
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {486988/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {486988/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Second Reading Passed 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 69
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-102, 8-103, 8-104, 8-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM