Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Person in a Position of Authority - Sexual Offenses With a Minor
Sponsored by
Delegates Clippinger, Arora, Simmons, Glenn, Cluster, Dumais, Glass, Lee, McComas, McDermott, Mitchell, Parrott, Smigiel, Sophocleus, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a specified prohibition against a specified "person in a position of authority" from engaging in specified conduct to prohibit a specified person in a position of authority from engaging in sexual contact, a sexual act, or vaginal intercourse with a minor who is enrolled or participating in the institution, program, or activity at which the person in a position of authority works; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0460
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {712110/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/5 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {308970/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Delegates Dumais, Arora, and Hough
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Senators Zirkin, Brochin, and Shank
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments {712110/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Special Order until 3/5 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 40
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
House 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 43A
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 42
Senate 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments {308970/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 House Requests Senate Recede 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Delegates Dumais, Arora, and Hough 68
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Senate Refuses to Recede 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Senators Zirkin, Brochin, and Shank 65
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-308, 3-325 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM