Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Cardin, Lafferty, and McIntosh
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering provisions of law concerning a credit against the State income tax for specified easements to allow an individual or a corporation that receives a specified tax credit certificate to claim the credit for an easement conveyed to the Maryland Environmental Trust, the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation, the Department of Natural Resources, or a specified land trust under specified circumstances; requiring the Department to issue a tax credit certificate under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0709
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Ways and Means and Environmental Matters
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-723 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM