Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Procedure - Assessments, Penalties, and Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the contents of the report of federal adjustment a person shall submit to a tax collector under specified circumstances; altering the calculation of the interest rate on tax deficiencies and refunds to provide that the rate is one-twelfth of the underpayment rate then in effect under § 6621 of the Internal Revenue Code; requiring the Comptroller to assess, in addition to specified penalties, a penalty against a person subject to a penalty under § 6662 of the Internal Revenue Code; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2016 3/30/2016 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
(   13-409, 13-604, 13-718 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page