Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Board of Education - Alternative Teacher Certification Program
Sponsored by
Washington County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Washington County Board of Education to establish an alternative teacher certification program; authorizing the Board to declare a critical teacher shortage and certify specified candidates to fill specified teacher shortage vacancies in specified areas during a specified time period; specifying who may fill a vacant position during the school year; providing that a candidate hired to fill a critical shortage teacher vacancy is not eligible for a specified certificate; making an exception; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0635
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-122 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM