Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Restorative Justice Programs
Sponsored by
Delegates McComas, Anderson, Carozza, Dumais, Kittleman, McConkey, B. Wilson, and C. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding community conferencing, community mediation, and similar agreements to the list of requirements for the entering of a nolle prosequi or stet for which a petition for expungement of court, police, and other governmental records may be filed; prohibiting the filing of a specified petition for expungement until community conferencing, community mediation, or specified other agreements are completed under specified circumstances; prohibiting expungement under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0388
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM