Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Required Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law permitting specified preexisting condition limitations in group and blanket health insurance contracts and policies; altering provisions of law relating to specified preexisting condition exclusions in individual health benefit plans to comply with requirements of the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act; clarifying the circumstances in which a grace period provision applies under a qualified health plan; requiring a student health plan to comply with the requirements of specified federal regulations; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {826488/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-6)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-8)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {826488/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (131-6) 50
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 48A
Senate 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Reassigned to Finance 50
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (38-8) 61
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-10D-01, 15-1206, 15-1208.1, 15-1208.2, 15-1315, 15-1318, 15-137.1, 15-508, 15-508.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM