Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Landfill Operator - Completion of Training Course
Sponsored by
Delegates Frush, Barnes, and Pena-Melnyk
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an individual to provide specified evidence of successful completion of a specified landfill management training course that has been approved by the Department of the Environment before the individual may operate a landfill in the State; and authorizing the Department to adopt specified regulations.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {220916/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {220916/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 51
Senate 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-2001 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM