Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional Relief
Sponsored by
Delegates Glass, Dumais, Vallario, Anderton, Atterbeary, Aumann, Buckel, Fisher, Ghrist, Jacobs, Kaiser, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, McComas, McDonough, McKay, Metzgar, A. Miller, Moon, Parrott, Reilly, Rey, Simonaire, Smith, Sophocleus, and West
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a judge in a final protective order to order the respondent to remain a specified distance away from the residence, place of employment, school, or temporary residence of a person eligible for relief.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0277
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1182 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 46
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Second Reading Passed 46
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47A
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM