Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults - Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Sponsored by
Delegates Lee, Clippinger, Glass, Gutierrez, McComas, McDonough, Mitchell, Niemann, B. Robinson, and F. Turner
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "undue influence" for purposes of a specified prohibition relating to obtaining property from a vulnerable adult or individual at least 68 years old by specifying that the term includes a specified breach of a fiduciary duty; authorizing a court to order the revocation of a professional license under specified circumstances; and providing that the State may institute a prosecution for a specified misdemeanor at any time.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-801 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM