Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure of Liens by Common Ownership Communities
Sponsored by
Delegate Niemann
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting an action to foreclose a lien on residential property that is brought by the governing body of a common ownership community under the Maryland Contract Lien Act from specified foreclosure procedures; subjecting an action to foreclose a lien on residential property that is brought by the governing body of a common ownership community under the Maryland Contract Lien Act to specified timing, notice, disclosure, service, publication, right to cure, and limitation of action provisions; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {310711/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Favorable with Amendments {310711/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 50
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 50
Senate 3/22/2013 3/22/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105.1, 7-105.13 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM