Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Establishment of Health Courts
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Kittleman, Krebs, Lam, Morhaim, Oaks, and Smith
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Establishment of Health Courts; requiring the Task Force to study the adequacy and cost of State laws and policies relating to the litigation of medical malpractice cases and make recommendations regarding the establishment of health courts to hear medical malpractice cases and the feasibility of assigning a medical malpractice case to a single judge throughout the litigation process; requiring the Task Force to report to the General Assembly by December 31, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0849
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0402 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM