Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License - Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport
Sponsored by
Delegates Bromwell, Aumann, Boteler, Cardin, Clagett, Cluster, Conaway, Costa, DeBoy, Donoghue, Elliott, Frank, Guzzone, Haddaway-Riccio, Hogan, Impallaria, Ivey, James, Kach, Kaiser, K. Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDermott, McDonough, W. Miller, Minnick, Mitchell, Myers, Norman, Oaks, Olszewski, Otto, Reznik, Schulz, Smigiel, Szeliga, Tarrant, Valderrama, Weir, and Wood
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the number of video lottery operation licenses and video lottery terminals that may be awarded by the Video Lottery Facility Location Commission to provide for the award of a license at Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport under specified conditions; authorizing up to 2,500 video lottery terminals at the airport; submitting the Act to a referendum of the qualified voters of the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0446 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1A-05, 9-1A-27, 9-1A-36 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM