Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund
Sponsored by
Delegate Lafferty
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill for fiscal years 2020 and 2021 an appropriation of $3,750,000 for the Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund; providing that the Governor is not required to include the appropriation in the fiscal year 2020 annual budget bill if on March 1, 2019, the Fund balance is less than $25,000,000 and in the fiscal year 2021 annual budget bill if on July 1, 2019, the Fund balance is less than $25,000,000; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0632
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM