Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Altering References From Mentally Defective to Substantially Cognitively Impaired Individual
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary, Dumais, Kittleman, McComas, Moon, Morales, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Smith, Sydnor, Valentino-Smith, and B. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 633
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering references to the term "mentally defective" individual to "substantially cognitively impaired" individual in provisions of law concerning specified sexual offenses and in provisions of law concerning the licensing of specified individuals to engage in business as an explosives manufacturer or dealer or to possess explosives for specified purposes.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 633
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 40
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed 40
House 3/14/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 43A
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 44
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Second Reading Passed 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 633
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-301, 3-304, 3-306, 3-307 )
(   11-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM