Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Public School Teachers - Preparation
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke and Patterson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain county boards of education to offer a Teacher Academy of Maryland Program to certain students; authorizing certain county boards to partner with and enter into an agreement with certain neighboring counties under certain circumstances; requiring the State Board of Education to adopt certain regulations for certain supervising teachers that include qualifications of a supervising teacher and procedures to ensure that a supervising teacher receives training in mentoring practices; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Public School Teachers - Preparation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {745163/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Public School Teachers - Preparation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Public School Teachers - Preparation
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {745163/1 Adopted 40
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Education - Public School Teachers - Preparation
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 42
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-703.2, 4-134, 6-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM