Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax - Assessors
Sponsored by
Delegates McIntosh, Clippinger, Anderson, Branch, Carter, Glenn, Hammen, Harper, Haynes, McHale, Mitchell, Oaks, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Stukes, Tarrant, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to employ and assign to the supervisor of assessments for Baltimore City six assessors in addition to the number of assessors assigned to the supervisor on June 1, 2014; requiring that the work of the assessors consist exclusively of conducting specified inspections of real property; and specifying the intent of the General Assembly that the inspections will result in additional property tax revenue that will defray the cost of employing the additional assessors.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-107, 2-217 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM