Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Old Goucher Revitalization District
Sponsored by
Delegates McIntosh and Anderson
Status
Veto sustained (0-140)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting an applicant for a specified Class B-D-7 license in a specified Old Goucher Revitalization District in the 43rd alcoholic beverages district in Baltimore City from specified zoning requirements; creating an exception under which the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City may issue specified new Class B-D-7 licenses in specified alcoholic beverages districts under specified circumstances; providing that a specified Class B-D-7 license may be transferred within the Old Goucher Revitalization District; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0384
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {284433/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Veto sustained (0-140)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Old Goucher Revitalization District
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Old Goucher Revitalization District
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 42
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments {284433/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Old Goucher Revitalization District
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Veto sustained (0-140)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-102, 12-1407, 12-1603, 12-1605, 12-905 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM