Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Last Dollar Scholarship - Established
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg and Lierman
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Last Dollar Scholarship; establishing specified application requirements; authorizing the use of the Scholarship for specified costs at specified institutions of higher education subject to a specified limitation; limiting the Scholarship to a maximum of $3,000 per academic year; authorizing the Scholarship to be renewed for up to an additional 4 years under specified circumstances; and requiring the Governor to appropriate at least $1,000,000 in the State budget to provide specified scholarships.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2016 3/30/2016 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-2901, 18-2902 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM