Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Educational Institutions - Notice of Criminal Activity and Threats to Safety
Sponsored by
Delegates Arentz, Adams, Aumann, Beitzel, Buckel, Cluster, Fisher, Ghrist, Hornberger, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jacobs, Jalisi, Kipke, Reilly, Saab, Vogt, and West
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a faculty member, teacher, or specified other employee of a specified educational institution to immediately notify an administrator if the individual observes or receives information about specified criminal activity or potential threats; requiring the administrator to forward specified information to an appropriate law enforcement agency as soon as practicable; providing that a specified individual is not subject to liability or disciplinary action arising solely from providing specified notice; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
House 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-101 )
(   27-101 through 27-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM