Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Deferred Retirement Option Program - Expanded Eligibility
Sponsored by
Delegates Serafini, Afzali, Aumann, Beitzel, Cluster, Eckardt, Elliott, Frank, George, Jacobs, Kach, Krebs, McComas, McConkey, Myers, Otto, Schulz, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing additional members of the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System to participate in the Deferred Retirement Option Program for 2 years if the member has at least 29 years and fewer than 34 years of creditable service; and altering the formula for computing the normal service retirement allowance of specified members of the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System who are participating in the Deferred Retirement Option Program.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1383 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM