Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Institutions of Higher Learning - Affirmative Consent Standard
Sponsored by
Delegate Morales
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, by September 1, 2016, that a policy on sexual assault adopted by the governing board of each institution of higher education include a specified affirmative consent standard; requiring a specified written policy on sexual assault to include a specified standard and specified statements; requiring a specified sexual assault policy to provide that specified circumstances negate a valid excuse to an alleged lack of affirmative consent; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Judiciary and Appropriations
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-601, 11-602 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM