Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public School Teachers - Certification - Continuing Education
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each county board of education to establish continuing education criteria for certificated public school teachers and to implement a system for verifying completion of the continuing education requirements; authorizing the criteria to include college course credit, leadership roles, preparation for National Board Certification or monetary grants, professional development, coaching, advising, or sponsoring extracurricular activities, and school-related community service; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0694
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-201.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM