Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pricing and Selection Committee for Blind Industries and Services of Maryland and the Employment Works Program - Staff
Sponsored by
Delegate Bromwell
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring Blind Industries and Services of Maryland to provide staff for the Pricing and Selection Committee for Blind Industries and Services of Maryland and the Employment Works Program; and requiring that the staff provided be a blind or visually impaired associate of Blind Industries and Services of Maryland and complete specified work related to the duties of the Committee.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {906284/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Pricing and Selection Committee for Blind Industries and Services of Maryland and the Employment Works Program - Staff
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable with Amendments {906284/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Pricing and Selection Committee for Blind Industries and Services of Maryland and the Employment Works Program - Staff
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Text - Chapter - Pricing and Selection Committee for Blind Industries and Services of Maryland and the Employment Works Program - Staff
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page