Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Investments in Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegates Fisher, Afzali, Boteler, Eckardt, George, Haddaway-Riccio, Hogan, Hough, Jacobs, Kach, Krebs, McComas, W. Miller, Norman, Otto, Ready, Schuh, and Serafini
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reducing the Maryland corporate income tax rate from 8.25% to 6% for a corporation that makes specified qualifying investments in the State; requiring the corporation to submit a specified calculation and a specified declaration to the Comptroller; requiring the corporation to provide evidence of the qualifying investments; authorizing the Comptroller to collect a specified amount from a corporation that does not provide the evidence; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2012; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1116 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-105, 10-105.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM